CA AB2501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on August 27 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-09-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 192 of the Penal Code, relating to manslaughter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary manslaughter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-27 - AB 2501 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2501 Bonilla By Lara (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - AB 2501 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 6589.).
2014-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4866.).
2014-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 5299.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2014-05-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2014-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code192Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2501&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_bill_20140424_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_bill_20140822_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_bill_20140903_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140429_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140528_0504PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140826_0652PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2501_vote_20140827_0311PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback