CA AB2488 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 35400.9 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: buses: length limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2488 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 Williams By Hancock (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2488 Williams (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2488 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 Williams By Hancock (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2488 Williams (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2488 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6564.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4883.). | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-07-05 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. | |
2012-06-18 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.). | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-30 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4593.) | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 35400.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |