CA AB2413 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45113 and 88013 of the Education Code, relating to school and community college employees.
Title
Classified school and community college employees: disciplinary hearings: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2413 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2413 Carrillo By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2413 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2413 Carrillo By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2413 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 4.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5051.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 3. Page 4818.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 26). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |