CA AB2403 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53750 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: assessments, fees, and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Assembly - AB 2403 RENDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2403 Rendon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2403 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2403 Rendon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2403 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5610.). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3930.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5001.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4961.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |