CA AB236 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.27 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10133.15 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: provider directories.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Assembly - AB 236 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9. Page 3968.) |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (January 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 14). |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |