CA AB2318 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: transportation detail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |