CA AB2286 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6401, 7522, and 22453.1 of, to add Chapter 5.7 (commencing with Section 6460) to Division 3 of, and to repeal Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 22350) of Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 413.40, 415.21, 417.40, 481.205, 680.330, and 1033.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 647 of the Evidence Code, and to amend Sections 241, 602, and 602.8 of the Penal Code, relating to process servers.
Title
Process servers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22350 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22453.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6460 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1033.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 413.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 415.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 417.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 481.205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 680.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 602.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |