CA AB2273 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 16.6 (commencing with Section 53077) to Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Career technical education: California Pilot Paid Internship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 53077 | New Code | See Bill Text |