CA AB2247 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66014.8 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: accreditation documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 2247 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2247 Williams By Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2247 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2247 Williams By Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2247 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6181.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6188.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4557.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66014.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |