CA AB2214 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2191 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to physicians and surgeons.
Title
Emergency room physicians and surgeons: continuing medical education: geriatric care.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2214 FOX Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2214 Fox By Torres (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2214 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2214 Fox By Torres (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2214 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 6088.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4421.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 5014.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |