CA AB2172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 22125 of the Water Code, relating to the Imperial Irrigation District.
Title
Irrigation districts: Imperial Irrigation District: electricity: assessment and inventory of assets.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 22125 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |