CA AB2171 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 1569.261) to Chapter 3.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2171 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2171 Wieckowski By Block (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2171 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2171 Wieckowski By Block (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2171 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 6586.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4862.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 23. Page 5293.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.261 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.886 | Amended Code | Citation Text |