CA AB2135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54220, 54223, 54225, 54226, and 54227 of, and to add Sections 54222.5 and 54233 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Surplus land: affordable housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2135 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2135 Ting By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2135 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2135 Ting By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2135 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6101.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4459.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5013.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 54223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |