CA AB2133 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 56366.1 of the Education Code, relating to special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education: nonpublic, nonsectarian schools or agencies: certification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code15100Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56366.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback