CA AB2105 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.38 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.38 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Coverage for PANDAS and PANS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |