CA AB1912 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 3261 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Electricity: legislation imposing mandated programs and requirements: third-party review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1912 Pacheco Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 1.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-02-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 3261 | New Code | See Bill Text |