CA AB1890 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23302 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: toll highways: motorcycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - AB 1890 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1890 Solorio (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - AB 1890 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1890 Solorio (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - AB 1890 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2012-06-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5415.). | |
2012-06-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-06-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.). | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-16 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-16 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4374.) | |
2012-04-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |