CA AB1750 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 33544 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: ethnic studies: report.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1750 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1750 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 20. Page 5249.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 26). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33543 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33544 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |