CA AB1727 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 150204 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to pharmaceuticals.
Title
Prescription drugs: collection and distribution program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - AB 1727 RODRIGUEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1727 Rodriguez By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1727 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1727 Rodriguez By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1727 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5800.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4194.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5002.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4965.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 150204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |