CA AB1725 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jun 4 @ 8:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jun 4 @ 8:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12525.4 to the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement settlements and judgments: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1725 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3934.) |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |