CA AB1698 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 115 of the Penal Code, relating to falsified public documents.
Title
Falsified public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1698 WAGNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1698 Wagner By Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1698 WAGNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1698 Wagner By Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1698 WAGNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6040.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4416.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 5327.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5218.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |