CA AB1668 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 94110, 94140, 94143, 94144, 94146, and 94149 of, and to add Section 94145.5 to, the Education Code, relating to educational facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Educational facilities: California Educational
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB1668 Wieckowski (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1668 WIECKOWSKI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1668 WIECKOWSKI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4598.). |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94145.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |