CA AB1643 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Division 122 (commencing with Section 153000) of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health Care for All Commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 153000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |