CA AB1619 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-06-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1296, 44910, 44929.21, and 44929.23 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificated school employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-18 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - AB 1619 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-25SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-06-18SenateIn committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5290.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
2014-04-30AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2014-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 26).
2014-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-03-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2014-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2014-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1619&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_bill_20140206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_bill_20140310_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_bill_20140318_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_bill_20140408_amended_asm_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_vote_20140326_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_vote_20140528_0350PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_vote_20140618_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1619_vote_20140618_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback