CA AB1614 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 67700 of, and to repeal Sections 67679.5 and 67686 of, the Government Code, relating to the Fort Ord Reuse Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fort Ord Reuse Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-22 - AB 1614 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1614 Monning By Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - AB 1614 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-30 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2012-08-22 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6103.).
2012-08-20 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-20 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4569.).
2012-06-28 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-27 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2012-06-25 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-06-18 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-06-15 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2012-04-19 Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2012-03-29 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-03-29 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 4184.)
2012-03-26 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-03-22 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 21).
2012-03-13 Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2012-03-12 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2012-02-23 Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2012-02-09 From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2012-02-08 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code67679.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code67686Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code67700Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1614&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120208_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120312_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120618_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120625_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_bill_20120929_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_vote_20120321_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_vote_20120329_1026AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_vote_20120613_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_vote_20120820_0106PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1614_vote_20120822_1119AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback