CA AB1537 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 875, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 875, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 65583.2 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
General plan housing element: regional housing need.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1537 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1537 Levine By Evans (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1537 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1537 Levine By Evans (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1537 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 875, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6348.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 4712.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5009.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.) |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |