CA AB1536 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 8400) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electricity: resource adequacy distributed generation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1536 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-01-11 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-01-07 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-12-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-10-14 | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2527.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-06-23 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1754.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |