CA AB144 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progress
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1465.6 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4461, 4463, 22511.57, 40203.5, and 42001.3 of, and to add Sections 40200.1 and 40203.6 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: distinguishing placards and special license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-02 - AB 144 MA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-08-31 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB144 Ma By Alquist (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-07 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-18 - AB 144 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-13 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-08 Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
2009-09-02 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 2899.)
2009-09-01 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-31 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2011.)
2009-08-17 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-23 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-07-08 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 7).
2009-07-01 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-29 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-24 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-06-16 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-06-04 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-05-18 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-18 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 1532.)
2009-05-11 Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1354.).
2009-05-04 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2009-04-16 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-15 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-14 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 13).
2009-03-04 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-03-02 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-26 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-01-23 From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
2009-01-22 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1465.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22511.57Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40200.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code40203.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40203.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code42001.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code4461Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code4463Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_144&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090122_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090302_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090415_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090511_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090624_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20090904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090413_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090518_1157AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090707_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090831_0441PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_144_vote_20090902_1203PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback