CA AB141 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1967.2 and 1967.3 of, and to add Section 1967.35 to, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 317 of the Statutes of 2008, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Treasure Island Transportation Management Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 141 AMMIANO Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB141 Ammiano Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 141 GORELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB141 Ammiano Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 141 GORELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6531.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4460.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 1562.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15). |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 8605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1967.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1967.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1967.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |