CA AB1397 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19792 of the Government Code, relating to veterans.
Title
State civil service: veterans preference data.
Sponsors
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1397 V. A. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1397 Committee on V. A. (Quirk-Silva) By Hueso (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1397 V. A. Assembly Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1397 Committee on V. A. (Quirk-Silva) By Hueso (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1397 V. A. Assembly Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6627.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4650.). |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1590.) |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19792 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |