CA AB129 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 107 of the Corporations Code, relating to business associations.
Title
Lawful money.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - AB 129 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB129 Dickinson By Hill (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 129 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB129 Dickinson By Hill (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 129 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 5646.). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 4020.). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 4). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3718.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 21). |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3534.) From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22362 | Amended Code | Citation Text |