CA AB1229 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1954.532 of the Civil Code, and to add and repeal Section 17503 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to rent control.
Title
Senior Citizen Rent Increase Exemption Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1002.) (pending re-referral to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.532 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17503 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |