CA AB1176 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 490.2, 496, and 29805 of the Penal Code, relating to theft, and calling an election, to take effect immediately.
Title
Theft: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AB 1176 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1176 Cooper By McGuire (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1176 Cooper By Hall (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1176 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1176 Cooper By McGuire (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1176 Cooper By Hall (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1176 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-07-01 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 5593.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 5593.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5593.). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4632.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4632.). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 5562.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 3901.). |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1876.). |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44269 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44271.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |