CA AB116 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8208, 8210, 8211, 8217, 8242, 8252, 8281, and 42238.15 of the Education Code, to amend Section 7928.405 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 10213.5, 10228, 10229.4, 10280, 10290, 10300.5, 10348, 10374.5, 10436, and 11461.6 of, and to add Sections 10227.6 and 10271.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to early childcare and education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Early childcare and education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - AB 116 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB116 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 116 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB116 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 116 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2416.). |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2416.) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1762.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Senate Rules Suspended (Ayes 32. Noes 8.) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 26). |
2023-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 836.) |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.) |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |