CA AB1126 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 40121, 40180, 40192, 40194, 40200, 40201, 41700, 41721, 41780.05, 41781, and 50001 of, and to add Section 40131.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: engineered municipal solid waste (EMSW) conversion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - AB 1126 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1126 Gordon By Hill (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - AB 1126 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3116.).
2013-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2230.).
2013-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-08-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2013-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1701.)
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2013-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code40106Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40116.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40121Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40131.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code40150.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code40171.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code40180Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40192Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40194Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40200Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code40201Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code41700Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code41721Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code41780.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code41781Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42649Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code44017.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code44100Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code44101Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code50001Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1126&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130321_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130418_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130321_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130418_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130508_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130812_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130814_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130830_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_bill_20130928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130524_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130529_1003AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130626_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130909_0110PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1126_vote_20130910_0156PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback