CA AB1060 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 621, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 621, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1060 FOX Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB1060 Fox By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1060 FOX Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB1060 Fox By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1060 FOX Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 621, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3346.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3351.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 12). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2414.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Page 2353.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2353.) |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1344.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 711.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |