CA AB1039 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19961.06 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Local gambling control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1039 Hall By Wright (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1039 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1039 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2095.). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 1465.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19961.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |