AZ SCR1023 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
General election day; all offices
Title
General election day; all offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
All Offices
Amendment
City
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Date
Election Dates
General Election
General Election Day
General Elections
School District
Town
Amendment
City
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Date
Election Dates
General Election
General Election Day
General Elections
School District
Town