AZ SCR1020 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; protection from liability
Title
Crime victims; protection from liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (40-19-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-04-04 | House Consent Calendar April 04, 2011 @ 2:10 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |