AZ SB1310 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; common core; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; common core; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
2014-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-20SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0)
2014-02-04SenateReferred to Senate ED Committee
2014-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2014-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback