AZ SB1212 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; wolf recovery; litigation costs
Title
Appropriation; wolf recovery; litigation costs
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |