AZ SB1183 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AZPOST; general fund; appropriation
Title
AZPOST; general fund; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adopt Rules
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Peace Officer Standards And Training Board (azpost) (h)
Azpost (see Also: Arizona Peace Officer Standards And Training Board) (h)
Boating And Water Sports
Boating Rules
General Fund (h)
Powers And Duties
Public Safety (h)
State Government - Title 41 (h)
Technical Correction
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Peace Officer Standards And Training Board (azpost) (h)
Azpost (see Also: Arizona Peace Officer Standards And Training Board) (h)
Boating And Water Sports
Boating Rules
General Fund (h)
Powers And Duties
Public Safety (h)
State Government - Title 41 (h)
Technical Correction