AZ SB1178 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; nonparticipating employers; liability
Title
ASRS; nonparticipating employers; liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |