AZ SB1173 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensed professional counselors; compact
Title
Licensed professional counselors; compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 77 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-15-4-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-11 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-2-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-4-3-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Active Duty Millitary Personnel
Adverse Actions
Binding Effect
Compact
Data System
Date Of Implementation
Definitions
Enforcement
Establishment
Licensed Professional Counselors
Licensure Compact
Obtaining A New Home State License
Oversight
Privilege To Practice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose
Rulemaking
Severability
State Participation
Telehealth
Adverse Actions
Binding Effect
Compact
Data System
Date Of Implementation
Definitions
Enforcement
Establishment
Licensed Professional Counselors
Licensure Compact
Obtaining A New Home State License
Oversight
Privilege To Practice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose
Rulemaking
Severability
State Participation
Telehealth