AZ HCM2006 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Federal lands; natural resources; permission
Title
Federal lands; natural resources; permission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |