AZ HB2642 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - House RULES Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - House RULES Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; isolation and seclusion rooms
Title
Schools; isolation and seclusion rooms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House RHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to House RHS Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RHS Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |