AZ HB2628 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prosecutor presence; interview of minor
Title
Prosecutor presence; interview of minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |