AZ HB2573 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; immunizations; registered nurses; posting
Title
Schools; immunizations; registered nurses; posting
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Sen. Andrew Sherwood [D] | Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] |
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Debbie McCune-Davis [D] | Rep. Bruce Wheeler [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |