AZ HB2555 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-22-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-22-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
SFB; department of administration
Title
SFB; department of administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-22-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-8-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Department Of Administration
Education - Title 15
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Lands - Title 37
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir
School Capital Finance
Sfb
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Education - Title 15
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Lands - Title 37
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir
School Capital Finance
Sfb
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2003 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 213.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 213.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 185.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3022.18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5701.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5754 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5759 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5763 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5764 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5782 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5783 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5784 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5787 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5788 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5789 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5790 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5794 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5853 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5857 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5858 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5030.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1089.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |