AZ HB2359 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to Senate TRANS Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11SenateReferred to Senate TRANS Committee
2014-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate TRANS Committee
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-03-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-03-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-17-2-0)
2014-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2014-02-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-20HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0)
2014-02-11HouseReferred to House TRANS Committee
2014-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-10HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2014-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback